ID HR006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RELIGION -- Stating findings of the House of Representatives and calling for an end to Christian persecution and calling for every government to recognize the fundamental rights of Christians to practice their faith without persecution or fear of death, rape, imprisonment, forced marriage, or physical violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the House of Representatives and calling for an end to Christian persecution and calling for every government to recognize the fundamental rights of Christians to practice their faith without persecution or fear of death, rape, imprisonment, forced marriage, or physical violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 31-39-0
2019-03-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-19HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2019-03-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback