ID HR004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HOUSE RULE -- Stating findings of the House of Representatives and adding a new Rule 79 regarding a veto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the House of Representatives and adding a new Rule 79 regarding a veto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 68-1-1
2019-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-04HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback