ID HR003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOUSE RULE 78 -- Stating findings of the House of Representatives and providing for a new Rule 78 to the Rules of the House of Representatives.
Title
Stating findings of the House of Representatives and providing for a new Rule 78 to the Rules of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |