ID HR003 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-12 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for compensation for attaches of the House of Representatives.
Title
Provides for compensation for attaches of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Moyle [R] | Rep. John Rusche [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | |
2012-01-12 | Title apvd | |
2012-01-12 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 66-0-4 | |
2012-01-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-01-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-10 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-09 | to printing | |
2012-01-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-09 | House intro |