ID HP005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-20 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-20 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating the findings of the Legislature and commending the citizens of Ada County for their foresight in their creation of the Ada County Highway District, and commending the Ada County Highway District for forty years of exemplary services to its customers.
Title
Stating the findings of the Legislature and commending the citizens of Ada County for their foresight in their creation of the Ada County Highway District, and commending the Ada County Highway District for forty years of exemplary services to its customers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-20 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | |
2012-01-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-01-20 | Hagedorn | |
2012-01-20 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-01-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-01-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-18 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-17 | to printing | |
2012-01-17 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-17 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/HP005.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/HP005.pdf |