ID HP001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Returned from Senate Adopted; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CONSTITUTIONAL DEFENSE COUNCIL FUND -- Stating findings of the Legislature and proclaiming that the Joyce Livestock Company and the LU Ranching Company should be reimbursed from the Constitutional Defense Council Fund for attorney's fees that they incurred for restoring, maintaining and advancing the sovereignty and authority of the State of Idaho over stockwater rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and proclaiming that the Joyce Livestock Company and the LU Ranching Company should be reimbursed from the Constitutional Defense Council Fund for attorney's fees that they incurred for restoring, maintaining and advancing the sovereignty and authority of the State of Idaho over stockwater rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Adopted; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-22Senateto House
2018-03-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-22SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 28-6-1
2018-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-19SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-19SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-19Houseto Senate
2018-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-03-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback