ID HJR008 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RIGHTS OF CRIME VICTIMS -- Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho regarding rights of crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho regarding rights of crime victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 42-28-0
2018-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback