ID HJM014 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:29 a.m. on March 13, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:29 a.m. on March 13, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MINING -- Stating the findings of the Legislature and recognizing the importance of mining in the history, development, and future of the State of Idaho.
Title
Stating the findings of the Legislature and recognizing the importance of mining in the history, development, and future of the State of Idaho.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:29 a.m. on March 13, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/HJM014/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/HJM014.pdf |