ID HJM014 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NATIONAL MONUMENTS AND WILDERNESS DESIGNATIONS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and stating opposition to any new federal national monument designations, or further designations of wilderness, in the State of Idaho without the approval of the United States Congress and the Idaho Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and stating opposition to any new federal national monument designations, or further designations of wilderness, in the State of Idaho without the approval of the United States Congress and the Idaho Legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-13SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-13SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-12HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-09HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-08Senateto House
2018-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-08SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback