ID HJM011 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:46 a.m. on February 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:46 a.m. on February 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ITAFOS CONDA -- Stating findings of the Legislature, supporting the Itafos Conda project, and requesting that the federal government commit adequate personnel and resources to the project.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature, supporting the Itafos Conda project, and requesting that the federal government commit adequate personnel and resources to the project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:46 a.m. on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2020-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/HJM011/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/HJM011.pdf |