ID HJM011 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COLUMBIA RIVER TREATY -- A joint memorial urging the U.S. Department of State to support specified positions in negotiations with Canada regarding any modification or future implementation of the Columbia River Treaty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint memorial urging the U.S. Department of State to support specified positions in negotiations with Canada regarding any modification or future implementation of the Columbia River Treaty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-13SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-13SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-12HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-09HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-08Senateto House
2018-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-08SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-19HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 19, 2018
2018-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-12HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback