ID HJM008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WILDERNESS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and supporting scientific adaptive management to implement the multiple-use concept and urging the release of specified wilderness study areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and supporting scientific adaptive management to implement the multiple-use concept and urging the release of specified wilderness study areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019
2019-03-15HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-11Senateto House
2019-03-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-11SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-02-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-25Houseto Senate
2019-02-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 50-20-0
2019-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback