ID HJM005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
Pending: Senate Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FEDERAL LANDS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Congress to enact federal legislation to require that when private lands are exchanged, purchased, or transferred to the federal government that other federal lands within the county must be sold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and urging Congress to enact federal legislation to require that when private lands are exchanged, purchased, or transferred to the federal government that other federal lands within the county must be sold.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-02-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-25Houseto Senate
2019-02-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 51-18-1
2019-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback