ID HJM003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:12 a.m. on February 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting the FCC to provide the resources necessary and take steps to procure the necessary expertise to prosecute and end interference and misuse of our communication systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting the FCC to provide the resources necessary and take steps to procure the necessary expertise to prosecute and end interference and misuse of our communication systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 11:12 a.m. on February 12, 2019
2019-02-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-02-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-11HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-08HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-07Senateto House
2019-02-07SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-07SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-31Houseto Senate
2019-01-31HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-31HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-29HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback