ID HJM001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:24 a.m. on February 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEALTH -- Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Federal Communications Commission and Congress take action to create a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline with a three-digit number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Federal Communications Commission and Congress take action to create a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline with a three-digit number.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 11:24 a.m. on February 22, 2019
2019-02-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-18Senateto House
2019-02-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-18SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-02-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-04Houseto Senate
2019-02-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 62-8-0
2019-02-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-23HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback