ID HJM001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:01 a.m. on March 19, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:01 a.m. on March 19, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Agriculture and the Chief of the U.S. Forest Service to recognize the dire conditions prevailing within and adjacent to the Frank Church-River of No Return Wilderness and adjacent national forests, further urging the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Agriculture to declare the Frank Church-River of No Return Wilderness and adjacent national forest lands to be a Natural Resource Disaster Area and further urging that the necessary priorities and emphasis be placed on prompt and practical actions to prevent further cumulative loss of the unique values of the wilderness.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Agriculture and the Chief of the U.S. Forest Service to recognize the dire conditions prevailing within and adjacent to the Frank Church-River of No Return Wilderness and adjacent national forests, further urging the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Agriculture to declare the Frank Church-River of No Return Wilderness and adjacent national forest lands to be a Natural Resource Disaster Area and further urging that the necessary priorities and emphasis be placed on prompt and practical actions to prevent further cumulative loss of the unique values of the wilderness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:01 a.m. on March 19, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-13 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read in full |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-04 | House | ADOPTED -- 57-13-0 |
2013-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |