ID HCR062 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PERSI RULE -- REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho relating to PERSI Contribution Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Public Employee Retirement System of Idaho relating to PERSI Contribution Rules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-22Senateto House
2018-03-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-22SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-20Houseto Senate
2018-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-20HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read in full as required -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-19HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback