ID HCR061 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GROUP INSURANCE AND TOTAL COMPENSATION STUDY - Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the state's employee group insurance plan structure and total compensation package, including salary and benefits, and to make recommendations.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the state's employee group insurance plan structure and total compensation package, including salary and benefits, and to make recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Patrick |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 31-0-4 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Davis, Hill, Johnson, Stennett Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | ADOPTED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Anderson |
2016-03-24 | House | 70-0-0 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | ADOPTED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |