ID HCR056 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE PUBLIC DEFENSE COMMISSION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the State Public Defense Commission relating to Rules Governing Standards for Defending Attorneys that Utilize Idaho's Principles of an Indigent Defense Delivery System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the State Public Defense Commission relating to Rules Governing Standards for Defending Attorneys that Utilize Idaho's Principles of an Indigent Defense Delivery System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-13Houseto Senate
2018-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 68-0-2
2018-03-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback