ID HCR055 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEPARTMENT OF JUVENILE CORRECTIONS -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Juvenile Corrections relating to Rules and Standards for Secure Juvenile Detention Centers.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Juvenile Corrections relating to Rules and Standards for Secure Juvenile Detention Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on March 23, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 68-0-2 |
2018-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |