ID HCR053 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MICHAEL PATRICK NUGENT -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing, honoring and commending Michael Patrick Nugent for his years of service to the Idaho Legislature, for his positive contributions to the Idaho Legislature, its employees and the people of the State of Idaho, and wishing him well in his retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing, honoring and commending Michael Patrick Nugent for his years of service to the Idaho Legislature, for his positive contributions to the Idaho Legislature, its employees and the people of the State of Idaho, and wishing him well in his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-13SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-13SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-12HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-09HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-08Senateto House
2018-03-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-08SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 -Webb
2018-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback