ID HCR050 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PORNOGRAPHY -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard and encouraging all state and local government agencies to ensure that pornographic materials are not accessible from their Internet connections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard and encouraging all state and local government agencies to ensure that pornographic materials are not accessible from their Internet connections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-20Senateto House
2018-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-20SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-09SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-09SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-08Houseto Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-3-2
2018-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseTake bill off General Orders; filed for second reading
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-23HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback