ID HCR049 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:44 p.m. on March 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PUBLIC SCHOOL FUNDING FORMULA -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the specific changes needed to implement the recommendations of the Public School Funding Formula Interim Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the specific changes needed to implement the recommendations of the Public School Funding Formula Interim Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 2:44 p.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-09Senateto House
2018-03-09SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-09SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 33-0-2
2018-03-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-22HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback