ID HCR048 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:23 a.m. on March 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MARILYN SHULER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing the many contributions and accomplishments of human rights activist Marilyn Shuler.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing the many contributions and accomplishments of human rights activist Marilyn Shuler.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:23 a.m. on March 8, 2018
2018-03-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-06HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-05Senateto House
2018-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-05SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote -Webb
2018-03-02SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-28SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-27SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-21Houseto Senate
2018-02-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-19HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback