ID HCR048 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and congratulating members of the Idaho Education Association on their organization's 120th anniversary.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and congratulating members of the Idaho Education Association on their organization's 120th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Secretary of State | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-13 | To enrol | |
2012-03-12 | to House | |
2012-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-12 | Malepeai | |
2012-03-12 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-12 | ADOPTED | |
2012-03-12 | 10th Ord | |
2012-03-09 | to 10th Ord | |
2012-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Educ | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-05 | to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | Ringo | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-29 | to printing | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/HCR048.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/HCR048.pdf |