ID HCR045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - to Com/HuRes
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - to Com/HuRes
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging the providers of health insurance in Idaho to develop their own insurance exchange as part of the solution to health insurance costs.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging the providers of health insurance in Idaho to develop their own insurance exchange as part of the solution to health insurance costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-03-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-13 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-12 | to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-12 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 49-13-8 | |
2012-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-24 | to Bus | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-23 | to printing | |
2012-02-23 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-23 | House intro |