ID HCR044 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FEE RULES -- HOUSE AND SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEES -- States findings of the Legislature and approves fee rules reviewed by the House Judiciary, Rules, and Administration Committee, and the Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and approves fee rules reviewed by the House Judiciary, Rules, and Administration Committee, and the Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 61-5-4 |
2022-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |