ID HCR044 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

THE DIOCESE OF BOISE -Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing the contributions of Catholics in Idaho history and congratulating the Diocese of Boise and all Idahoans of Catholic faith on the one hundred twenty-fifth anniversary of the creation of the Diocese of Boise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

THE DIOCESE OF BOISE -Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing the contributions of Catholics in Idaho history and congratulating the Diocese of Boise and all Idahoans of Catholic faith on the one hundred twenty-fifth anniversary of the creation of the Diocese of Boise.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 9:24 a.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-20Senateto House
2018-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-20SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-12Houseto Senate
2018-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 13, 2018
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, March 7, 2018
2018-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-19HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-16HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 19, 2018
2018-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-14HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback