ID HCR039 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:11 a.m. on March 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

2018 WINTER OLYMPICS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and extending congratulations and best wishes for success to the Idahoans selected to represent the United States at the 2018 Winter Olympics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and extending congratulations and best wishes for success to the Idahoans selected to represent the United States at the 2018 Winter Olympics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 11:11 a.m. on March 5, 2018
2018-03-05HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-02-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-02-27Senateto House
2018-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-27SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0
2018-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-12Houseto Senate
2018-02-12HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2018
2018-02-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-06HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback