ID HCR039 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:11 a.m. on March 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:11 a.m. on March 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
2018 WINTER OLYMPICS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and extending congratulations and best wishes for success to the Idahoans selected to represent the United States at the 2018 Winter Olympics.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing and extending congratulations and best wishes for success to the Idahoans selected to represent the United States at the 2018 Winter Olympics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:11 a.m. on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-05 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2018-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |