ID HCR032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:41 a.m. on March 4, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:41 a.m. on March 4, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RULE 23 -- Stating findings of the Legislature and providing for a joint rule of the Senate and the House of Representatives for the display of the words “In God We Trust” above the chairs of the presiding officers.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and providing for a joint rule of the Senate and the House of Representatives for the display of the words “In God We Trust” above the chairs of the presiding officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:41 a.m. on March 4, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 29-3-3 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-19 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-19 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-5-0 |
2020-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |