ID HCR030 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:15 a.m. on January 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

GOVERNOR -- STATE OF STATE ADDRESS -- Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State address.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-15HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 8:15 a.m. on January 12, 2018
2018-01-12HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-01-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-01-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-01-10HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-01-09HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-01-08Senateto House
2018-01-08SenateTitle apvd
2018-01-08SenateRead in full as required) -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-01-08SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced; read first time at length
2018-01-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-08Houseto Senate
2018-01-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-08HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read in full as required -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-01-08HouseReported Printed and Held at Desk
2018-01-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback