ID HCR028 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JIM JONES -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Jim Jones for his 50 years of public service to the citizens of Idaho, including as Attorney General and Chief Justice of the Supreme Court.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring Jim Jones for his 50 years of public service to the citizens of Idaho, including as Attorney General and Chief Justice of the Supreme Court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 22, 2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HCR028/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HCR028.pdf |