ID HCR023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Environmental Quality relating to Water Quality Standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Environmental Quality relating to Water Quality Standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-18Houseto Senate
2019-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-18HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 67-0-3
2019-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-14HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback