ID HCR020 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Retained on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Retained on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ARPA FUNDS -- States findings of the Legislature and creates a legislative interim committee to study and make recommendations regarding the expenditure of federal funds for sewer and broadband infrastructure under the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and creates a legislative interim committee to study and make recommendations regarding the expenditure of federal funds for sewer and broadband infrastructure under the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-09 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-04-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |