ID HCR018 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:08 a.m. on March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DIVISION OF VOCATIONAL REHABILITATION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation relating to Rules and Minimum Standards Governing Extended Employment Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation relating to Rules and Minimum Standards Governing Extended Employment Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 11:08 a.m. on March 26, 2019
2019-03-26HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-03-25SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-20Senateto House
2019-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-20SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2019-03-13SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-12Houseto Senate
2019-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 53-13-4
2019-03-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback