ID HCR017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:17 a.m. on March 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE TAX COMMISSION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the State Tax Commission relating to Property Tax Administrative Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the State Tax Commission relating to Property Tax Administrative Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:17 a.m. on March 25, 2019
2019-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-19Senateto House
2019-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-19SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-18SenateRetained on calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 69-0-1
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-25HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback