ID HCR017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IMMIGRANTS -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing the important history and ongoing contributions of legal immigrants toward the building of the United States.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing the important history and ongoing contributions of legal immigrants toward the building of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 22, 2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HCR017/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/HCR017.pdf |