ID HCR016 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE TAX COMMISSION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the State Tax Commission relating to Property Tax Administrative Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the State Tax Commission relating to Property Tax Administrative Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 69-0-1
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-25HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback