ID HCR015 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DR. TOM CADE -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing Dr. Tom Cade as a widely respected scientist and honoring his contributions to the State of Idaho, the country, and the world at large in his raptor conservation efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing Dr. Tom Cade as a widely respected scientist and honoring his contributions to the State of Idaho, the country, and the world at large in his raptor conservation efforts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019
2019-03-15HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-11Senateto House
2019-03-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-11SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-02-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-19Houseto Senate
2019-02-19HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback