ID HCR014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUREAU OF OCCUPATIONAL LICENSES -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Bureau of Occupational Licenses relating to the State Board of Chiropractic Physicians.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Bureau of Occupational Licenses relating to the State Board of Chiropractic Physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-1-4 |
2019-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |