ID HCR009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HYDROPOWER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing hydropower as Idaho's greatest renewable resource and further recognizing the immense benefit hydropower provides as a carbon-free, inexpensive electrical power source and as an economic driver for tourism, recreation, and agriculture in Idaho.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing hydropower as Idaho's greatest renewable resource and further recognizing the immense benefit hydropower provides as a carbon-free, inexpensive electrical power source and as an economic driver for tourism, recreation, and agriculture in Idaho.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:16 a.m. on March 18, 2019
2019-03-18HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-08HouseReported Printed and Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback