ID HCR009 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - to Health/Wel
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - to Health/Wel
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging the Idaho Department of Administration and the Idaho Department of Health and Welfare to develop proposals and requests relating to the operation and use of the Idaho State School and Hospital.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging the Idaho Department of Administration and the Idaho Department of Health and Welfare to develop proposals and requests relating to the operation and use of the Idaho State School and Hospital.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-01 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-28 | to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-28 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 45-24-1 | |
2011-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-16 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-02-16 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-15 | to printing | |
2011-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-15 | House intro |