ID HCR006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on February 28, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing Music in Our Schools Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing Music in Our Schools Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on February 28, 2019
2019-02-28HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-02-27SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-02-27SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-02-26HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-25HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-02-22Senateto House
2019-02-22SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-22SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-21SenateRetained on calendar
2019-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2019-02-11SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-08Houseto Senate
2019-02-08HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-30HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback