ID HCR003 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:12 a.m. on March 6, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:12 a.m. on March 6, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the State Board of Education commence rulemaking to provide that cursive handwriting shall be taught in the state public elementary schools.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the State Board of Education commence rulemaking to provide that cursive handwriting shall be taught in the state public elementary schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:12 a.m. on March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-28 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read in full |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-12 | House | ADOPTED -- 68-2-0 |
2013-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |