ID HCR001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:07 a.m. on January 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

GOVERNOR'S ADDRESS -- Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear a message from the Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear a message from the Governor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 8:07 a.m. on January 11, 2019
2019-01-11HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-01-10SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-01-10SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-01-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-01-08HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-01-07Senateto House
2019-01-07SenateTitle apvd
2019-01-07SenateRead in full as required) -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-01-07SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-01-07SenateIntroduced; read first time at length
2019-01-07SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-01-07Houseto Senate
2019-01-07HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-07HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read in full as required -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-01-07HouseReported Printed and Held at Desk
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback