ID HCR001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on January 13, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on January 13, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GOVERNOR -- STATE OF STATE ADDRESS -- Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Title
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-16 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:10 a.m. on January 13, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-01-11 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-10 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-01-09 | Senate | to House |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time at length |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-01-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-01-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-01-09 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-01-09 | House | Reported Printed and Held at Desk |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |