ID HCR001 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-17 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 01/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-17 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 01/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Title
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Moyle [R] | Rep. John Rusche [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-17 | Delivered to Secretary of State on 01/14 | |
2011-01-14 | To Secretary of State | |
2011-01-13 | Pres signed | |
2011-01-12 | Sp signed | |
2011-01-12 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-01-11 | To enrol | |
2011-01-10 | to House | |
2011-01-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-01-10 | Davis | |
2011-01-10 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-01-10 | ADOPTED | |
2011-01-10 | Rls susp | |
2011-01-10 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-10 | Senate intro | |
2011-01-10 | to Senate | |
2011-01-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-01-10 | Moyle | |
2011-01-10 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-01-10 | ADOPTED | |
2011-01-10 | Rls susp | |
2011-01-10 | Held at Desk | |
2011-01-10 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-10 | to printing | |
2011-01-10 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-10 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/HCR001.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/HCR001.pdf |