ID H0825 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- OITS -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of Information Technology Services for fiscal years 2022 and 2023.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of Information Technology Services for fiscal years 2022 and 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2022 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 03/28/2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:35 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-25 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 25-0-10 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-25 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-25 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-25 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |