ID H0802 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- CONSTITUTIONAL OFFICERS -- Relates to the appropriation to constitutional officers for fiscal year 2023.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to constitutional officers for fiscal year 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | March 31, 2022 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Law without signature |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 34-0-1 -Engelking |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |